NY S07294 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8938
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to directing the department of financial services to study, evaluate and make recommendations concerning online lending institutions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to directing the department of financial services to study, evaluate and make recommendations concerning online lending institutions.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-13SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A8938
2018-01-08SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.22
2018-01-05SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A08938 (Same As) 2018-06-01 - signed chap.61

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback