NY S07276 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 26 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-29 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10468
Status: Introduced on March 26 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-29 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10468
Summary
Enacts provisions relating to an emergency spending plan for the period April 1, 2010 through April 11, 2010; provides for the administration of certain funds and accounts related to the 2010-2011 budget (part A); extends provisions relating to permitting the secretary of state to provide special handling of all documents filed or issued by the department of corporations (part B); includes NYC housing development corporation under the state bond issuance charge (part C); foregoes adjustments to cost of living adjustment for designated human service programs during the 2010-2011 state fiscal year (part D); and relates to residential health care facilities and Medicaid reimbursements (part E).
Title
Enacts provisions relating to an emergency spending plan for the period April 1, 2010 through April 11, 2010; provides for the administration of certain funds and accounts related to the 2010-2011 budget (part A); extends provisions relating to permitting the secretary of state to provide special handling of all documents filed or issued by the department of corporations (part B); includes NYC housing development corporation under the state bond issuance charge (part C); foregoes adjustments to cost of living adjustment for designated human service programs during the 2010-2011 state fiscal year (part D); and relates to residential health care facilities and Medicaid reimbursements (part E).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | SUBSTITUTED BY A10468 | |
2010-03-29 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.323 | |
2010-03-29 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | |
2010-03-26 | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A10468 (Same As) 2010-03-29 - signed chap.19
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S07276&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |