NY S07249 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-20 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-20 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates certain persons appointed by a county sheriff's office, outside of the city of New York, when acting pursuant to their special duties serving as uniformed deputies working in a specialized function including but not limited to mounted patrol, marine patrol, snowmobile patrol, ATV patrol, forensic, scientific, or aviation as peace officers.
Title
Designates certain persons appointed by a county sheriff's office, outside of the city of New York, when acting pursuant to their special duties serving as uniformed deputies working in a specialized function including but not limited to mounted patrol, marine patrol, snowmobile patrol, ATV patrol, forensic, scientific, or aviation as peace officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-20 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2012-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-05-31 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-05-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.941 |
2012-05-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A10645 (Same As) 2012-06-12 - referred to codes