NY S07242 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on November 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-05 - APPROVAL MEMO.4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to installing Lyme and tick-borne disease warning signs at all state-managed parks including trail entryways and campgrounds due to the increased presence of such diseases within the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to installing Lyme and tick-borne disease warning signs at all state-managed parks including trail entryways and campgrounds due to the increased presence of such diseases within the state.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-05AssemblyAPPROVAL MEMO.4
2018-11-05AssemblySIGNED CHAP.354
2018-10-24SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-19Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2018-05-31Assemblyordered to third reading cal.956
2018-05-31Assemblysubstituted for a8829
2018-05-16Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2018-05-16SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-05-16SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-05-14SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1154
2018-05-14SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-05-01SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2018-01-05SenateREFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION

Same As/Similar To

A08829 (Same As) 2018-05-31 - substituted by s7242

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback