NY A08829 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on December 22 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - substituted by s7242
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to installing Lyme and tick-borne disease warning signs at all state-managed parks including trail entryways and campgrounds due to the increased presence of such diseases within the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to installing Lyme and tick-borne disease warning signs at all state-managed parks including trail entryways and campgrounds due to the increased presence of such diseases within the state.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31Assemblysubstituted by s7242
2018-05-24Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.956
2018-05-22Assemblyreported
2018-05-07Assemblyamend by restoring to original print 8829
2018-03-20Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2018-03-14Assemblyprint number 8829a
2018-03-14Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to tourism, parks, arts and sports development
2018-01-03Assemblyreferred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development
2017-12-22Assemblyreferred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development

Same As/Similar To

S07242 (Same As) 2018-11-05 - APPROVAL MEMO.4

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback