NY S07236 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8368B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8368B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to owner liability for failure of operator to comply with traffic control indications in the city of Mt. Vernon; authorizes such city to establish a demonstration program for traffic-control signal photo violation monitoring devices.
Title
Relates to owner liability for failure of operator to comply with traffic control indications in the city of Mt. Vernon; authorizes such city to establish a demonstration program for traffic-control signal photo violation monitoring devices.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8368B |
2014-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1674 |
2014-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-05-20 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7236A |
2014-05-20 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2014-05-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A08368 (Same As) 2014-07-22 - signed chap.101