NY S07193 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - referred to small business
Pending: Assembly Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - referred to small business
Pending: Assembly Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides guidelines to determine regulatory fines for small businesses and amends the effective date for S. 5815-C and A. 7540-B to be repealed two years after the effective date.
Title
Provides guidelines to determine regulatory fines for small businesses and amends the effective date for S. 5815-C and A. 7540-B to be repealed two years after the effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | Assembly | referred to small business |
2020-02-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-02-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-13 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.117 |
2020-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08951 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to small business