NY S07169 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-29 - SIGNED CHAP.544
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-29 - SIGNED CHAP.544
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Orangetown to offer a certain retirement option to Orangetown police officers Patrick J. Casey, Elizabeth M. Muckell and Keith E. Trojan.
Title
Authorizes the town of Orangetown to offer a certain retirement option to Orangetown police officers Patrick J. Casey, Elizabeth M. Muckell and Keith E. Trojan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-29 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.544 |
2021-10-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | home rule request |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.724 |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | substituted for a7444 |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-09 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1717 |
2021-06-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A07444 (Same As) 2021-06-10 - substituted by s7169