NY A07444 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - substituted by s7169
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - substituted by s7169
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Orangetown to offer a certain retirement option to Orangetown police officers Patrick J. Casey, Elizabeth M. Muckell and Keith E. Trojan.
Title
Authorizes the town of Orangetown to offer a certain retirement option to Orangetown police officers Patrick J. Casey, Elizabeth M. Muckell and Keith E. Trojan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Assembly | substituted by s7169 |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.724 |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | rules report cal.724 |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S07169 (Same As) 2021-10-29 - SIGNED CHAP.544