NY S07152 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES
Pending: Senate Women's Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES
Pending: Senate Women's Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "public university emergency contraception education act" requiring public universities to develop, produce and distribute informational materials related to emergency contraception.
Title
Enacts the "public university emergency contraception education act" requiring public universities to develop, produce and distribute informational materials related to emergency contraception.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Parker [D] | Sen. Nathalia Fernandez [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] |
Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. Roxanne Persaud [D] | Sen. Julia Salazar [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | referred to health |
2023-06-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-01 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1541 |
2023-06-01 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-05-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES |