NY S07127 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-22 - PRINT NUMBER 7127A
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-22 - PRINT NUMBER 7127A
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits rental car companies from discriminating on the basis of the geographical location of the residence of the person attempting to enter into the rental agreement; prohibits imposing of additional charges or conditions; provides injunctive relief and imposes a fine of up to $1,000 for each violation.
Title
Prohibits rental car companies from discriminating on the basis of the geographical location of the residence of the person attempting to enter into the rental agreement; prohibits imposing of additional charges or conditions; provides injunctive relief and imposes a fine of up to $1,000 for each violation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-22 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7127A |
2018-05-22 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A01782 (Same As) 2017-12-15 - enacting clause stricken
A09980 (Same As) 2018-05-30 - print number 9980a
A09980 (Same As) 2018-05-30 - print number 9980a