NY A01782 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-15 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-15 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits rental car companies from discriminating on the basis of the geographical location of the residence of the person attempting to enter into the rental agreement; prohibits imposing of additional charges or conditions; provides injunction relief and imposes a fine of up to $1,500 for each violation.
Title
Prohibits rental car companies from discriminating on the basis of the geographical location of the residence of the person attempting to enter into the rental agreement; prohibits imposing of additional charges or conditions; provides injunction relief and imposes a fine of up to $1,500 for each violation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-15 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-01-13 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S07127 (Same As) 2018-05-22 - PRINT NUMBER 7127A