NY S07118 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to admission requirements for graduate-level teacher and educational leader programs.
Title
Relates to admission requirements for graduate-level teacher and educational leader programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-12-28 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2020-12-28 | Senate | SUBSTITUTION RECONSIDERED |
2020-01-22 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.132 |
2020-01-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7118 |
2020-01-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2020-01-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-01-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.102 |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2019-04-29 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-04-29 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-04-25 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.185 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | reported |
2019-01-22 | Senate | referred to higher education |
2020-01-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A2405 |
2020-01-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.132 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A02405 (Same As) 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES