NY S07098 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9615
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9615
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes the text of emergency rules available online.
Title
Makes the text of emergency rules available online.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9615 |
2016-05-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-05-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.890 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
Same As/Similar To
A09615 (Same As) 2016-09-09 - signed chap.305