NY A09615 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-5)
Status: Passed on September 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-09 - signed chap.305
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-5)
Status: Passed on September 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-09 - signed chap.305
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes the text of emergency rules available online.
Title
Makes the text of emergency rules available online.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-09 | Senate | signed chap.305 |
2016-08-30 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-01 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-01 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.890 |
2016-06-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7098 |
2016-04-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2016-04-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-04-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-04-01 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.479 |
2016-03-29 | Assembly | reported |
2016-03-22 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S07098 (Same As) 2016-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9615