NY S07096 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - SIGNED CHAP.490
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - SIGNED CHAP.490
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to minimum standards for online posting of rulemaking information.
Title
Relates to minimum standards for online posting of rulemaking information.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-28 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.490 |
2016-11-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.829 |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | substituted for a9625 |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2016-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-05-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-05-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.888 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
Same As/Similar To
A09625 (Same As) 2016-06-06 - substituted by s7096