NY S07075 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-22 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-22 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the eligibility of New York city transit authority employees for performance of duty disability retirement.
Title
Relates to the eligibility of New York city transit authority employees for performance of duty disability retirement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-22 - Senate - Senate Civil Service And Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-22 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2024-03-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7075A |
2024-03-12 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2023-05-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07389 (Same As) 2024-03-13 - print number 7389a