NY S07066 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-04 - SIGNED CHAP.345
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-04 - SIGNED CHAP.345
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the provision of financing by the dormitory authority to the Moffat library of Washingtonville.
Title
Authorizes the provision of financing by the dormitory authority to the Moffat library of Washingtonville.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 128 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 128 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-04 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.345 |
2014-08-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.93 |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | substituted for a9459 |
2014-05-19 | Assembly | referred to libraries and education technology |
2014-05-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-05-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-05-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.611 |
2014-04-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09459 (Same As) 2014-06-09 - substituted by s7066