NY S07064 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 17 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-20 - PRINT NUMBER 7064C
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 17 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-20 - PRINT NUMBER 7064C
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits the villages of Upper Brookville, Flower Hill, East Hampton, Westbury, Saddle Rock and Southampton located in Nassau and Suffolk county to adopt local laws to implement a demonstration program imposing monetary liability not to exceed fifty dollars on the owner of a vehicle for failure of an operator to comply with stop signs; permits such villages to install and operate stop sign photo violation monitoring systems as part of such demonstration program.
Title
Permits the villages of Upper Brookville, Flower Hill, East Hampton, Westbury, Saddle Rock and Southampton located in Nassau and Suffolk county to adopt local laws to implement a demonstration program imposing monetary liability not to exceed fifty dollars on the owner of a vehicle for failure of an operator to comply with stop signs; permits such villages to install and operate stop sign photo violation monitoring systems as part of such demonstration program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-20 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7064C |
2024-05-20 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2024-05-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7064B |
2024-05-15 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2024-05-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7064A |
2024-05-06 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2023-05-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A10169 (Same As) 2024-05-20 - print number 10169b