NY S07056 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - VETOED MEMO.286
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - VETOED MEMO.286
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to providing an increased death benefit for the survivors of Theodore Raffel.
Title
Relates to providing an increased death benefit for the survivors of Theodore Raffel.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-28 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.286 |
2016-11-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.500 |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | substituted for a9577 |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2016-06-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-06 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1457 |
2016-06-06 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-03-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09577 (Same As) 2016-06-16 - substituted by s7056