NY S07034 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-22 - APPROVAL MEMO.38
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-22 - APPROVAL MEMO.38
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the amounts of certain real and personal property that are exempt from money judgments and bankruptcy; provides a choice between claiming the state or federal exemptions in such instances; provides for cost of living adjustments in such amounts every three years.
Title
Increases the amounts of certain real and personal property that are exempt from money judgments and bankruptcy; provides a choice between claiming the state or federal exemptions in such instances; provides for cost of living adjustments in such amounts every three years.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-07-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 109 N: 35 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-22 | APPROVAL MEMO.38 | |
2010-12-22 | SIGNED CHAP.568 | |
2010-12-15 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-07-01 | returned to senate | |
2010-07-01 | passed assembly | |
2010-07-01 | ordered to third reading cal.663 | |
2010-07-01 | substituted for a8735a | |
2010-06-23 | referred to judiciary | |
2010-06-23 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-06-23 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-04-19 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2010-04-14 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2010-04-13 | 1ST REPORT CAL.380 | |
2010-03-15 | PRINT NUMBER 7034A | |
2010-03-15 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES | |
2010-03-09 | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A8735 (Same As) 2010-07-01 - substituted by s7034a