NY S07016 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-14 - SIGNED CHAP.436
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-14 - SIGNED CHAP.436
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to dissolving the Madison County Sewer District and transferring its assets, obligations and liabilities to the town of Cazenovia.
Title
Relates to dissolving the Madison County Sewer District and transferring its assets, obligations and liabilities to the town of Cazenovia.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-14 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.436 |
2016-11-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | home rule request |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | home rule request |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.184 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | substituted for a9539 |
2016-05-25 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2016-05-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-05-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-05-25 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2016-04-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-04-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.532 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A09539 (Same As) 2016-06-14 - substituted by s7016