NY S07008 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - SIGNED CHAP.241
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - SIGNED CHAP.241
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Mesivta Atres Yaakov to apply for a retroactive real property tax exemption for parcels in the town of Hempstead, county of Nassau.
Title
Authorizes Mesivta Atres Yaakov to apply for a retroactive real property tax exemption for parcels in the town of Hempstead, county of Nassau.
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Skelos [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 127 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 127 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-18 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.241 |
2012-07-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.223 |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | substituted for a9937a |
2012-06-13 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2012-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-06-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-06-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1125 |
2012-05-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7008A |
2012-05-21 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2012-04-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A09937 (Same As) 2012-06-14 - substituted by s7008a