NY S07002 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-03 - SIGNED CHAP.488
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Removes prohibition on tax return preparers or facilitators operating in same premises as licensed check cashers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Removes prohibition on tax return preparers or facilitators operating in same premises as licensed check cashers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-10-03AssemblySIGNED CHAP.488
2012-09-21SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2012-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2012-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.521
2012-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a9890
2012-06-04Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2012-06-04SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-04SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-05-30SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2012-05-23Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2012-05-22Senate1ST REPORT CAL.861
2012-04-20SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS

Same As/Similar To

A09890 (Same As) 2012-06-20 - substituted by s7002

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback