NY S06995 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.195
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.195
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Jain Samaj of Long Island, Inc. to apply to the assessor of the county of Nassau for a retroactive real property tax exemption on a certain parcel of land.
Title
Authorizes Jain Samaj of Long Island, Inc. to apply to the assessor of the county of Nassau for a retroactive real property tax exemption on a certain parcel of land.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-21 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.195 |
2016-07-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.57 |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | substituted for a8416b |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2016-06-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-04-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-04-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.531 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A08416 (Same As) 2016-06-08 - substituted by s6995