NY S06992 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-22 - SIGNED CHAP.165
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-22 - SIGNED CHAP.165
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage the American shad.
Title
Extends the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage the American shad.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 123 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-22 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.165 |
2014-07-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.732 |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | substituted for a9433 |
2014-05-20 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2014-05-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-05-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-05-19 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.635 |
2014-05-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6992A |
2014-05-06 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2014-04-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A09433 (Same As) 2014-05-29 - substituted by s6992a