NY S06981 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-10 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-10 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the prosecution of juveniles who commit family offenses against his or her parent or legal guardian under article seven of the family court act, rather than article eight of such act.
Title
Requires the prosecution of juveniles who commit family offenses against his or her parent or legal guardian under article seven of the family court act, rather than article eight of such act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-10 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2010-06-09 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2010-06-08 | 1ST REPORT CAL.843 | |
2010-05-11 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CODES | |
2010-03-03 | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A8281-C (Same As) 2010-01-19 - amended on third reading 8281c