NY A08281 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-19 - amended on third reading 8281c
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-19 - amended on third reading 8281c
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the prosecution of juveniles who commit family offenses against his or her parent or legal guardian under article seven of the family court act, rather than article eight of such act.
Title
Requires the prosecution of juveniles who commit family offenses against his or her parent or legal guardian under article seven of the family court act, rather than article eight of such act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 125 N: 16 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-19 | amended on third reading 8281c | |
2010-01-06 | ordered to third reading cal.568 | |
2010-01-06 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-01-06 | DIED IN SENATE | |
2009-06-22 | REFERRED TO RULES | |
2009-06-22 | delivered to senate | |
2009-06-22 | passed assembly | |
2009-06-22 | ordered to third reading rules cal.602 | |
2009-06-22 | rules report cal.602 | |
2009-06-22 | reported | |
2009-06-22 | reported referred to rules | |
2009-06-19 | print number 8281b | |
2009-06-19 | amend (t) and recommit to codes | |
2009-06-18 | print number 8281a | |
2009-06-18 | amend and recommit to codes | |
2009-05-27 | reported referred to codes | |
2009-05-12 | referred to children and families |
Same As/Similar To
S6981 (Same As) 2010-06-10 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING