NY S06979 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires all state agencies to require all contractors that provide services for state purposes pursuant to a contract, submit an annual employment report with the job titles and number of employees necessary to perform such contract; further provides that such information be submitted electronically in order for such information to be searchable and transferable to a spreadsheet or database.
Title
Requires all state agencies to require all contractors that provide services for state purposes pursuant to a contract, submit an annual employment report with the job titles and number of employees necessary to perform such contract; further provides that such information be submitted electronically in order for such information to be searchable and transferable to a spreadsheet or database.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate Procurement And Contracts Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Senate - Senate Procurement and Contracts Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Senate - Senate Procurement and Contracts Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO PROCUREMENT AND CONTRACTS |
2023-06-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6979A |
2023-06-05 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2023-05-22 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2023-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO PROCUREMENT AND CONTRACTS |
Same As/Similar To
A06505 (Same As) 2024-03-18 - REFERRED TO PROCUREMENT AND CONTRACTS