NY S06977 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-30 - referred to correction
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-30 - referred to correction
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the definition of persons with a disability for purposes of the definition of special populations to include people with a mental health diagnosis, people on the office of mental health caseload, people with an intellectual, developmental or cognitive diagnosis, people with physical disability or mobility impairment, and people with a sensorial disability diagnosis.
Title
Clarifies the definition of persons with a disability for purposes of the definition of special populations to include people with a mental health diagnosis, people on the office of mental health caseload, people with an intellectual, developmental or cognitive diagnosis, people with physical disability or mobility impairment, and people with a sensorial disability diagnosis.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime And Correction Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime And Correction Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-30 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2024-05-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-05-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-03-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-03-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.681 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2023-05-23 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2023-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A07533 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to correction