NY S06962 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Vetoed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - VETOED MEMO.283
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - VETOED MEMO.283
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for patient access to FDA approved abuse-deterrent technology to help combat opioid abuse.
Title
Provides for patient access to FDA approved abuse-deterrent technology to help combat opioid abuse.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-28 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.283 |
2016-11-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.461 |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | substituted for a10478 |
2016-05-17 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2016-05-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-05-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-05-16 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.851 |
2016-05-16 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-05-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6962A |
2016-05-11 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2016-03-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A09487 (Same As) 2016-05-27 - amend by restoring to original print 9487
A10478 (Same As) 2016-06-16 - substituted by s6962a
A10478 (Same As) 2016-06-16 - substituted by s6962a