NY S06962 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to ticket pricing and extends certain provisions of the arts and cultural affairs law.
Title
Relates to ticket pricing and extends certain provisions of the arts and cultural affairs law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-06-09 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 6962A |
2014-05-19 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.689 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |