NY S06955 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - SIGNED CHAP.376
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - SIGNED CHAP.376
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates that portion of state route 357 in the town of Franklin, county of Delaware, as the "Corporal Nicholas K. Uzenski Memorial Highway".
Title
Designates that portion of state route 357 in the town of Franklin, county of Delaware, as the "Corporal Nicholas K. Uzenski Memorial Highway".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-29 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.376 |
2016-09-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.352 |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | substituted for a9556b |
2016-06-07 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2016-06-07 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-07 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2016-05-25 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6955A |
2016-05-25 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-25 | Senate | returned to senate |
2016-05-25 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2016-05-03 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2016-05-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-05-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-03-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-03-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.412 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A09556 (Same As) 2016-06-15 - substituted by s6955a