NY S06937 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - VETOED MEMO.563
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - VETOED MEMO.563
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Grants retroactive tier IV membership in the New York state and local employees' retirement system to Jill Alix, Chris Karwiel, Jessica Strizzi and Taryn Ward.
Title
Grants retroactive tier IV membership in the New York state and local employees' retirement system to Jill Alix, Chris Karwiel, Jessica Strizzi and Taryn Ward.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-17 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.563 |
2014-12-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | home rule request |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.364 |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a9235 |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2014-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-12 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2014-05-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.796 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09235 (Same As) 2014-06-18 - substituted by s6937