NY S06934 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies the use for which certain state lands are to be transferred to the city of New Rochelle.
Title
Specifies the use for which certain state lands are to be transferred to the city of New Rochelle.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2020-01-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-09 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.13 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08953 (Same As) 2020-06-08 - enacting clause stricken