NY S06929 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on October 25 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Grants a tax deferment for persons sixty-five years of age or over who own and occupy real property in a city having a population of one million or more persons.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Grants a tax deferment for persons sixty-five years of age or over who own and occupy real property in a city having a population of one million or more persons.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2018-02-06SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2018-02-05Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2018-01-30Senate1ST REPORT CAL.329
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO CITIES
2017-10-25SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A09713 (Same As) 2018-02-02 - referred to aging

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback