NY S06914 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-06 - PRINT NUMBER 6914A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 15 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-06 - PRINT NUMBER 6914A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for updates to rates for residential health care facilities.
Title
Provides for updates to rates for residential health care facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-22 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6914A |
2024-05-06 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2024-01-22 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2023-05-23 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2023-05-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A05905 (Same As) 2024-05-08 - print number 5905b