NY S06906 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-07 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-07 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the village of Schuylerville, Saratoga county, to conduct up to two fishing tournaments per calendar year in the fourteen mile stretch of the Hudson River between Champlain Canal Lock C5 and Champlain Canal Lock C4 and to exempt such tournaments from catch and release orders.
Title
Allows the village of Schuylerville, Saratoga county, to conduct up to two fishing tournaments per calendar year in the fourteen mile stretch of the Hudson River between Champlain Canal Lock C5 and Champlain Canal Lock C4 and to exempt such tournaments from catch and release orders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-07 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2018-05-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-05-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-01-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-29 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.276 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2017-10-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08753 (Same As) 2018-05-23 - enacting clause stricken