NY S06898 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5039A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5039A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a portion of the state highway system as the "Major General Norbert J. Rappl Memorial Highway".
Title
Designates a portion of the state highway system as the "Major General Norbert J. Rappl Memorial Highway".
Sponsors
Sen. Samra Brouk [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-05 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A5039A |
2023-06-05 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1586 |
2023-06-05 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-05-19 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6898A |
2023-05-19 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2023-05-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A05039 (Same As) 2023-11-10 - signed chap.613