NY S06896 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-29 - SIGNED CHAP.182
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-29 - SIGNED CHAP.182
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends certain provisions relating to expanding the child health insurance plan from 2021 until 2023.
Title
Extends certain provisions relating to expanding the child health insurance plan from 2021 until 2023.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-29 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.182 |
2021-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.493 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | substituted for a7660 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-24 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1314 |
2021-05-24 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-05-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A07660 (Same As) 2021-06-07 - substituted by s6896