NY S06873 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-11 - SIGNED CHAP.271
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-11 - SIGNED CHAP.271
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the towns of Lorraine and Worth in Jefferson county to elect a single town justice to preside in the town courts of both towns.
Title
Authorizes the towns of Lorraine and Worth in Jefferson county to elect a single town justice to preside in the town courts of both towns.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-11 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.271 |
2020-10-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.85 |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | substituted for a9052 |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2020-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-02-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.457 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-11-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A09052 (Same As) 2020-11-11 - SIGNED CHAP.271