NY S06862 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-08 - VETOED MEMO.108
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-08 - VETOED MEMO.108
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for a line of duty presumption for disabilities of fire alarm dispatchers in a city with a population of one million or more.
Title
Provides for a line of duty presumption for disabilities of fire alarm dispatchers in a city with a population of one million or more.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Iwen Chu [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-08 | Senate | VETOED MEMO.108 |
2023-11-29 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2023-06-21 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2023-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-06-21 | Assembly | home rule request |
2023-06-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.870 |
2023-06-21 | Assembly | substituted for a7250 |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2023-06-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-07 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2023-06-01 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1534 |
2023-06-01 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-05-23 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2023-05-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07250 (Same As) 2023-06-21 - substituted by s6862