NY S06856 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - SIGNED CHAP.486
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - SIGNED CHAP.486
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to establishing a temporary commission for the purpose of celebrating the 100th anniversary of World War I.
Title
Relates to establishing a temporary commission for the purpose of celebrating the 100th anniversary of World War I.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-28 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.486 |
2016-11-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.183 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | substituted for a9524 |
2016-05-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2016-05-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-05-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-05-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.614 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6856A |
2016-03-08 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2016-03-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
Same As/Similar To
A09524 (Same As) 2016-06-14 - substituted by s6856a