NY S06836 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.188
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.188
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the leasing and licensing of the main house at Caumsett state historical park preserve in the ninth park region.
Title
Authorizes the leasing and licensing of the main house at Caumsett state historical park preserve in the ninth park region.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-21 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.188 |
2016-07-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.236 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | substituted for a9429b |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2016-06-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-25 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-05-24 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1083 |
2016-05-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6836B |
2016-05-13 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2016-04-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6836A |
2016-04-29 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2016-02-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
Same As/Similar To
A09429 (Same As) 2016-06-14 - substituted by s6836b