NY S06819 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-14 - SIGNED CHAP.435
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-14 - SIGNED CHAP.435
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to eligibility for real property tax credit for payments in lieu of taxes made by a Qualified Empire Zone Enterprise for property located at 560 Broadway, Schenectady, New York.
Title
Relates to eligibility for real property tax credit for payments in lieu of taxes made by a Qualified Empire Zone Enterprise for property located at 560 Broadway, Schenectady, New York.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-14 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.435 |
2016-11-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.68 |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | substituted for a9349 |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2016-06-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-03-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-03-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.400 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A09349 (Same As) 2016-06-08 - substituted by s6819