NY S06816 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to accessing records under the freedom of information law including notification procedures and the release of names of natural persons and residential addresses.
Title
Relates to accessing records under the freedom of information law including notification procedures and the release of names of natural persons and residential addresses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-02-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-02-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.364 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2017-06-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08255 (Same As) 2018-02-12 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS