NY S06815 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-03 - PRINT NUMBER 6815B
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-03 - PRINT NUMBER 6815B
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a portion of the state highway system as the "Detective First Grade Brian Mulkeen Memorial Highway".
Title
Designates a portion of the state highway system as the "Detective First Grade Brian Mulkeen Memorial Highway".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-03 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6815B |
2020-06-03 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2020-02-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6815A |
2020-02-07 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2019-10-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A09681 (Same As) 2020-07-16 - held for consideration in transportation