NY S06809 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - APPROVAL MEMO.16
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - APPROVAL MEMO.16
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the transmission of caller identification information to consumers.
Title
Relates to the transmission of caller identification information to consumers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-28 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.16 |
2016-11-28 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.484 |
2016-11-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.703 |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | substituted for a9457a |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2016-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-09 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6809B |
2016-06-07 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6809A |
2016-05-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.608 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A09457 (Same As) 2016-06-15 - substituted by s6809b