NY S06802 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-01 - SIGNED CHAP.320
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-01 - SIGNED CHAP.320
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides authority for dormitory authority financing and construction of facilities for Mercy Flight Central, Inc., of Central New York.
Title
Provides authority for dormitory authority financing and construction of facilities for Mercy Flight Central, Inc., of Central New York.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-05-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-01 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.320 |
2012-07-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2012-05-14 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-05-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-05-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.566 |
2012-05-14 | Assembly | substituted for a9703 |
2012-05-07 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2012-05-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-05-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-05-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-05-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-04-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.611 |
2012-03-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09703 (Same As) 2012-05-14 - substituted by s6802