NY S06801 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-29 - SIGNED CHAP.181
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-29 - SIGNED CHAP.181
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends certain provisions providing enhanced consumer and provider protections under contracts with managed care organizations.
Title
Extends certain provisions providing enhanced consumer and provider protections under contracts with managed care organizations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-29 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.181 |
2021-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.492 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | substituted for a7659 |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | referred to health |
2021-06-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-24 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1309 |
2021-05-24 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-05-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A07659 (Same As) 2021-06-07 - substituted by s6801